MA H898 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for setting fires or using fireworks, pyrotechnic or incendiary or explosive devices or materials. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to fires and explosions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S765 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1344 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1054 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S2099 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3058 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1270 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H3613 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H561 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H991 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H992 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2168 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1344 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1054 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S2099 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3058 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1270 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H3613 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H561 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H991 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H992 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2168 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H898 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H898.pdf |