MA H852 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5072
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Provost of Somerville, a petition of Denise Provost and others that the Department of Environmental Protection and the Department of Public Health be directed to develop health risk assessment guidelines of proposed school construction sites. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting school children from environmental toxins
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5072 |
2019-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S297 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S464 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2131 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Accompanied S2075
H426 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5072 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S297 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S464 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2131 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Accompanied S2075
H426 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5072 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H852 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H852.pdf |