MA H846 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-05 - Read; and referred to the Senate Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-05 - Read; and referred to the Senate Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Conservation and Recreation to enter into a lease agreement for certain parcels of land in the town of Milton
Title
Authorize the Department of Conservation and Recreation to enter into a lease agreement for certain parcels of land in the town of Milton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-05 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-11-04 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-09-23 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-08-20 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 8/6 at 10:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00846.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00846.htm |