MA H816 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to election law reform. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to election law reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H621 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
S1069 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3234 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S1641 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1502 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1051 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
S1069 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3234 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S1641 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1502 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1051 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H816 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H816.pdf |