MA H811 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pesticide products eligible for use on the outdoor grounds of schools, child care centers or school age child care programs. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to improving pesticide protections for Massachusetts schoolchildren
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H3440 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4450
H452 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H585 (Similar To) 2023-07-06 - Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H452 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H585 (Similar To) 2023-07-06 - Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H811 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H811.pdf |