MA H800 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Fisherman's Wharf in the town of Provincetown
Title
Fisherman's Wharf in the town of Provincetown
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-31 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-31 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for for the next sitting | |
2010-07-01 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-07-27 | Discharged from committee and recommitted to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture | |
2009-06-24 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00800.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00800.htm |