MA H787 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the General Court or any other officer of the Commonwealth to enact laws which allow citizens to vote from anywhere but their specified polling place. Election Laws.
Title
An Order relative to the establishment of mail-in voting in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Kelly Pease [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H1438 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5274
H3828 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - New draft substituted, see H4793
H788 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S28 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Hearing scheduled from 03/4/2021 @ 4:00 PM until 03/08/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Written Testimony Only
H3935 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2022
H3950 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H71 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H73
S464 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2049 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S477 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S448 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3828 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - New draft substituted, see H4793
H788 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S28 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Hearing scheduled from 03/4/2021 @ 4:00 PM until 03/08/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Written Testimony Only
H3935 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2022
H3950 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H71 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H73
S464 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2049 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S477 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S448 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H787 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H787.pdf |