MA H774 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2503

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to safe drinking water in schools. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring safe drinking water in schools

Sponsors

Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2503
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2503 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback