MA H764 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish guidelines and recommendations for best practices for industry entities to measure, track, and reduce emissions from embodied carbon of buildings. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Incorporating embodied carbon into state climate policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S2090 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H764 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H764.pdf |