MA S2090 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2531
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Accompanied S2531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Accompanied S2531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to incorporate embodied carbon into state climate policy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Incorporating embodied carbon into state climate policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Accompanied S2531 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2475 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2805 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2813
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2531 (Replaced by) 2024-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2829
H4818 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2805 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2813
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2531 (Replaced by) 2024-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2829
H4818 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2090 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2090.pdf |