MA H760 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure that polling places are accessible to handicapped and elderly voters. Election Laws.
Title
Assuring that polling places are accessible to elderly and physically challenged voters
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2443 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
H786 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S449 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1954 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S468 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S456 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H783 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
H786 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S449 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1954 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S468 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S456 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H783 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H760.pdf |