MA H748 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4471
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create safe environments for home care workers and consumers. Elder Affairs.
Title
To create safe environments for home care workers and consumers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4471 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S2142 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4471 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2142 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4471 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H748 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H748.pdf |