MA H717 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of Glyphosate weed killer on land located within, on or above a federally-designated sole source aquifer. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of Glyphosate by utility companies and/or government entities on land located within, on, or above a federally-designated sole source aquifer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1476 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2608 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3426 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H1478 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
H1476 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2608 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3426 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H1478 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H717.pdf |