MA H1478 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to classify synthetic marijuana and other dangerous chemical compounds as class C controlled substances. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to synthetic marijuana and other dangerous chemical compounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4310 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4310 (Replaced by) 2016-06-16 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1476 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2608 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3426 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H3473 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1476 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2608 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3426 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H3473 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1478.pdf |