MA H717 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by H3857

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to the distribution of raw milk. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the distribution of raw milk

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3857
2013-06-20JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in David Prouty High School
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H3857 (Replaced by) 2014-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback