MA H699 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the prohibition of alcohol in designated polling places. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to designation of polling places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H233 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H208 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S190 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H338 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H648 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2232 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S2344
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2344 (Similar To) 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H233 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H208 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S190 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H338 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H648 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2232 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S2344
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2344 (Similar To) 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H699 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H699.pdf |