MA H688 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4743
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the condominium laws. Housing.
Title
Relative to a special commission to study condominium law
Sponsors
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. James Miceli [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4743 |
2017-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1117 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H753 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H687 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H4167 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4294
H4743 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H753 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H687 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H4167 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4294
H4743 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H688 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H688.pdf |