MA H1564 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of condominiums. Revenue.
Title
Relative to fairness during the phase-in of condominium development
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H688 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
S1117 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1565 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H753 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H687 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H4167 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4294
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H688 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
S1117 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1565 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H753 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H687 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H4167 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4294
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1564 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1564.pdf |