MA H663 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize 17 year old citizens to vote in town elections and town meetings in the town of Concord. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Allowing 17 year olds to vote in town elections and town meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4403 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H722 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H720 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H657 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H662 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S409 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2317 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - New draft substituted, see S2951
S2318 (Similar To) 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639
H720 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H657 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H662 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S409 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2317 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - New draft substituted, see S2951
S2318 (Similar To) 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H663 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H663.pdf |