MA S2318 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establishing a real estate transfer fee upon the transfer of property in the town of Concord. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a real estate transfer fee upon the transfer of property in the town of Concord

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-15HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-12SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4009 (Similar To) 2019-08-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3995 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Senate concurred
S2243 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback