MA H616 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protections for hospitals that contract with Medicaid managed care organizations. Health Care Financing.
Title
Ensuring protections for hospitals that contract with Medicaid managed care organizations
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S656 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S336 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1167 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144
S639 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H2222 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H3728 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1207 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H2161 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S620 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2213 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2690 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S336 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1167 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144
S639 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H2222 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H3728 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1207 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H2161 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S620 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2213 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2690 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H616 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H616.pdf |