MA H598 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure continued health insurance coverage for children. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure continued health insurance coverage for children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S554 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S647 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H543 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H528 (Similar To) 2017-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2182 (Similar To) 2017-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H548 (Similar To) 2017-09-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1408 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H581 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback