MA H591 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4218

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to students that receive free or reduced-price meals under the federal National School Lunch Program. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding breakfast after the bell

Sponsors

Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Sheila Harrington [R]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Donald Humason [R]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20HouseNew draft substituted, see H4218
2019-11-20HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2019-11-20HouseRules suspended
2019-11-20HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2019-11-20HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2019-11-20HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4218
2019-11-12HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4218 (Replaced by) 2020-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback