MA H575 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4182

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to solar power energy generation at the Essex North Shore Agricultural and Technical School. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to clean energy generation at the Essex North Shore Agricultural and Technical School

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-12HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4182
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S517 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1931 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1971 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2020
S1955 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H4182 (Replaced by) 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback