MA S1955 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to solar power and the green economy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to solar power and the green economy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1931 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1971 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2020
H575 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4182
H450 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied S1971
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1931 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1971 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2020
H575 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4182
H450 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied S1971
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1955 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1955.pdf |