MA H570 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4330
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts secure choice savings program and to encourage retirement planning. Financial Services.
Title
To encourage retirement planning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4330 |
2018-01-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H615 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2225 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
H4330 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2225 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
H4330 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H570 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H570.pdf |