MA H550 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Ms. Keefe of Worcester, a petition of Mary S. Keefe and others that banks be required to mediate in good faith with homeowners to identify alternative resolutions before starting foreclosures. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To facilitate alternatives to foreclosure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2017-10-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S147 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S576 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H533 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1357 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback