MA H548 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to school disciplinary hearings. Education.
Title
Relative to school disciplinary hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H548.pdf |