MA H5408 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4339
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - See H4339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - See H4339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Site Information & Links
Title
Site Information & Links
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | House | See H4339 |
Same As/Similar To
H4339 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H2812 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H5180 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4983 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - See H3762
H5152 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - See H5106
H4984 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - See H4838
H5141 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - See H5060
H3902 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - See H3827
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H2812 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H5180 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4983 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - See H3762
H5152 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - See H5106
H4984 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - See H4838
H5141 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - See H5060
H3902 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - See H3827
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5408 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5408.pdf |