MA H537 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S291
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-17 - Accompanied S291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-17 - Accompanied S291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the personal care allowance of residents of long-term care facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
To increase the personal needs allowance for residents of long term care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-17 | Senate | Accompanied S291 |
2013-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S291 (Replaced by) 2014-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2237
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H537 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H537.pdf |