MA H534 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for diabetes management in schools. Education.
Title
Providing for diabetes management in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4638 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1377 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2020-08-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2020-08-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H534 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H534.pdf |