MA H5252 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4923
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Montague to grant one additional liquor license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Montague to grant one additional liquor license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-05 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-11-21 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-08-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-08-29 | House | New draft of H4923 |
2022-08-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4923 (Replaces) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
H4231 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2022
H5214 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5302
H4924 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5061 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5223
H5354 (Similar To) 2022-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5385
H4231 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2022
H5214 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5302
H4924 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5061 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5223
H5354 (Similar To) 2022-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5385
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5252 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5252.pdf |