MA H4924 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Montague be authorized to exempt all positions in the police department from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting all positions in the police department of the town of Montague from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/05/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4294 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4841 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H4973 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4231 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2022
H4923 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
H4841 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H4973 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4231 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2022
H4923 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4924 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4924.pdf |