MA H522 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4426
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring carbon monoxide alarms in schools. Education.
Title
Requiring carbon monoxide alarms in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4426 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1377 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4426 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4426 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H522 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H522.pdf |