MA H5186 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5187
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Massachusetts' transportation resources and climate (see House, No. 5151), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment G of House, No. 5187). August 10, 2022.
Title
Providing for the establishment of a special commission to make recommendations on the implementation of roadway and congestion pricing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-08-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-08-15 | House | For message, see H5187, Attachment G |
2022-08-15 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2022-08-15 | House | Enacted as section 61 of H5151 |
Same As/Similar To
H5187 (Replaced by) 2022-08-15 - See H5151
H5184 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5185 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5116 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Governor's amendment adopted
H5184 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5185 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5116 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Governor's amendment adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5186.pdf |