MA H5145 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a permanent senior means tested property tax exemption in the town of Concord. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To make permanent a senior means tested property tax exemption in Concord
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2020 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-11-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5145.pdf |