MA H5076 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5046
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-01 - Reported, in part, by H5163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-01 - Reported, in part, by H5163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 5046, as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. July 21, 2022.
Title
To improve and modernize the information technology systems and capacities of the judiciary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-30 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #233 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-21 - House - House Passed to be engrossed- 146 YEAS to 7 NAYS (Y: 146 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-21 - House - House Passed to be engrossed- 146 YEAS to 7 NAYS (Y: 146 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-01 | House | Reported, in part, by H5163 |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Brownsberger-Creem-Tarr), in concurrence |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendment |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee of conference appointed - (Day-Tyler-Smola) |
2022-07-31 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #233 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1) |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Read third |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S3087 |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S3087 |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S3086 |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S3085 |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S3084 |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-07-21 | House | Passed to be engrossed- 146 YEAS to 7 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 228 ) |
2022-07-21 | House | H5046, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H5046 (Replaces) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
H1520 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
H4499 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5046
H5163 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5180 for section 54
H1520 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
H4499 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5046
H5163 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5180 for section 54