MA H4499 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1520
Note: Legislation replaced by H5046
Note: Legislation replaced by H5046
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve and modernize the information technology systems and capacities of the judiciary
Title
To improve and modernize the information technology systems and capacities of the judiciary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | House | New draft substituted, see H5046 |
2022-07-20 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5046 |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 13, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/29/2022 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2022-03-01 | House | New draft of H1520 |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1520 (Replaces) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
H4493 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4844 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5046 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
H5076 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported, in part, by H5163
S3084 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H5163 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5180 for section 54
H4493 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4844 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5046 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
H5076 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported, in part, by H5163
S3084 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H5163 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5180 for section 54
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4499 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4499.pdf |