MA H5076 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to elections of the Swansea water district. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Swansea water district elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-10-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-10-22HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2020-10-01HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback