MA H507 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5004
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Category 2 gaming licensees to host table games and slot machines. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To responsibly protect employment and revenue derived from the Commonwealth’s gaming industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5004 |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
S40 (Similar To) 2021-08-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2509
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3822 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3898
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
S2511 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2854
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
H4815 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 203 of the Acts of 2022
H5004 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3536 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
S40 (Similar To) 2021-08-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2509
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3822 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3898
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
S2511 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2854
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
H4815 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 203 of the Acts of 2022
H5004 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3536 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H507 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H507.pdf |