MA H507 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2254
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a curriculum on personal financial literacy in the public schools. Education.
Title
Relative to financial literacy in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2254 |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2254 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H507 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H507.pdf |