MA H5053 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Eric J. Iwaniec, an employee of the Department of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Eric J. Iwaniec
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-09-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-09-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2024-08-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
S2957 (Similar To) 2024-09-26 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H5058 (Similar To) 2024-09-26 - Senate concurred
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
S2957 (Similar To) 2024-09-26 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H5058 (Similar To) 2024-09-26 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H5053 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H5053.pdf |