MA H5032 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4959
Note: Legislation replaced by H5162
Note: Legislation replaced by H5162
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the division of capital asset management and maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the town of Danvers
Title
Authorizing the division of capital asset management and maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the town of Danvers
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-31 | House | New draft substituted, see H5162 |
2022-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5162 |
2022-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-07-18 | House | New draft of H4959 |
2022-07-18 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4959 (Replaces) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5032
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H5162 (Replaced by) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2022
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H5162 (Replaced by) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5032 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5032.pdf |