MA H502 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of an advisory board to promote the improved use of school-level data for effective resource allocation decisions at the local level. Education.
Title
Relative to stakeholder data advisory group recommendations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-03-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H502 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H502.pdf |