MA H5010 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Maynard be authorized to change the name of the board of selectmen in said town to the select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the board of selectmen of the town of Maynard

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-07SenateLaid before the Governor
2021-01-06SenateEnacted
2021-01-06HouseEnacted
2021-01-05SenatePassed to be engrossed
2021-01-05SenateBills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted
2021-01-05SenateRead third
2021-01-05SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2020-12-29SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2020-12-29HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-12-29HouseRules suspended
2020-12-23HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-12-23HouseRules suspended
2020-12-23HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2020-10-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-10-01SenateSenate concurred
2020-09-28HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback