MA H5 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the State Auditor (House, No. 3) as relates to improving the internal controls within state agencies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Improving the internal controls within state agencies
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2761 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5055
S1886 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1995 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1065 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2716
S212 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1907 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H753 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S470
H2761 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5055
S1886 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1995 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1065 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2716
S212 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1907 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H753 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S470
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5.pdf |