MA H499 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Jones of North Reading, a petition of Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and others that schools be required to maintain non-patient specific epinephrine auto-injectors to be used in the event of anaphylactic emergencies. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency stock epinephrine in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H463 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S261 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1113 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S306 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H421 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S330 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2324 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback