MA H4988 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3133

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To protect locked out employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect locked out employees

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-12-06HousePassed to be engrossed
2018-12-06HouseAmendment 3 adopted
2018-12-06HouseAmendment 1 adopted
2018-12-06HouseRead third (title changed)
2018-12-04HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-12-04HouseNew draft of H3133
2018-12-04HousePending new draft of H3133
2018-12-04HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3133 (Replaces) 2018-12-04 - New draft substituted, see H4988
H1005 (Similar To) 2017-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2370 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1370 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2514 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback