MA H4984 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Dighton be authorized to change the name of the board of selectmen in said town to the select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the board of selectmen of the town of Dighton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4984 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4984.pdf |