MA H496 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to amending the banking laws and statutes of the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
Amending the banking laws and related statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2018-01-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1121 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
H1039 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2423 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2018
H3918 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2018
H46 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3930 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2018
H4076 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
H1039 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2423 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2018
H3918 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2018
H46 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3930 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2018
H4076 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H496 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H496.pdf |